This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:24:58 (UTC).

RYAN Z SINDON ET AL VS JAKE HARDEN WEAVER THOMPSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2016 RYAN Z SINDON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAKE HARDEN WEAVER THOMPSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6352

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SINDON DENESE

SINDON RYAN Z.

Defendants and Respondents

THOMPSON JAKE HARDEN WEAVER

THOMPSON STEPHEN

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MANNING SHERI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/22/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/28/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/29/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/29/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/17/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/21/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration

5/28/2019: Declaration

SUMMONS

7/8/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/8/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Ryan Z. Sindon (Plaintiff); Denese Sindon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Ryan Z. Sindon (Plaintiff); Denese Sindon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Delaying and Prosecuting the Action Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 583.410) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiffs / Plaintiffs' Counsel for Failure to Comply With California Rules of Court Section 3.110(b)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed A...) of 03/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed A...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Unknown event - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiffs / Plaintiffs' Counsel for Failure to Comply With California Rules of Court Section 3.110(b)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Delaying and Prosecuting the Action Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 583.410) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ryan Z. Sindon (Plaintiff); Denese Sindon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC626352    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RYAN Z. SINDON, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JAKE HARDEN WEAVER THOMPSON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC626352

[TENTATIVE] ORDER

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 14, 2020

Defendants propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiffs on 6/25/19. On 10/10/19, the Court granted Defendants’ motions to compel Plaintiffs to respond to the discovery and ordered Plaintiffs to pay sanctions. On 12/02/19, the Court granted Defendants’ unopposed motion for terminating sanctions. On 12/11/19, Plaintiffs filed this motion to reconsideration of the 12/02/19 order. Plaintiffs contend they served responses, in compliance with the Code, prior to the 12/02/19 hearing, and the Court should have denied the motion in light of the responses.

Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 12/31/19. The Court has not received opposition to the motion.

The Court has read and considered Rodriguez v. Brill (2015) 234 Cal.App.4th 715, and finds the case is on all fours with the instant case. The Rodriguez Court held that (a) a judgment of dismissal that implements a terminating sanction for discovery abuse is a “dismissal entered” for purposes of application of §473(b)’s mandatory relief provision, and (b) an application for relief from a terminating discovery sanction is “in proper form” if (1) verified discovery responses are delivered to opposing counsel before the hearing on the application for relief and (2) the content of those responses substantially complies with applicable requirements. Rodriguez at 719-720. Notably, Plaintiffs served responses in substantial compliance with the Code shortly before the hearing on the motion for terminating sanctions. While Rodriguez concerned a motion for relief under §473(b) and this is a motion for reconsideration, the Court finds the same analysis applies, and grants the motion for reconsideration.

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC626352    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 3

this time for three reasons. First, the Court previously imposed monetary sanctions. Second, a brief review of the prior motions reveals that the discovery at issue goes to the “heart” of Plaintiffs’ case, and therefore an issue or evidentiary sanction would be tantamount to a terminating sanction. Third, Plaintiffs have not opposed this motion and appear to have abandoned the case.

Defendants do not seek imposition of additional monetary sanctions at this time, and none are imposed. Plaintiffs’ case against Moving Defendants is dismissed.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.