This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:08:50 (UTC).

RYAN M. BLANCO VS JENNIFER MILLAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 RYAN M BLANCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JENNIFER MILLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0203

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYAN M. BLANCO AN INDIVIDUAL

RYAN M. BLANCO AN

Defendants

DOES 1-25 INCLUSIVE

JENNIFER MILLAN

JENN MILLAN AN AN INDIVIDUAL

SWEET EMBELLISHMENTS

EMBELLISHMENTS SWEET

CALIF. LAND LAW RICHARD COWLES

MILLAN JENNIFER

JENN MILLAN AN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER K. JAFARI

Defendant Attorney

CALIF. LAND LAW ( RICHARD COWLES )

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department SOS27, Ross Klein, Presiding; Final Status Conference (T: 1-30-17C/F 9-22-16O/C DISMISSAL ENTERED) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (OF ENTIRE ACTION W/ PREJ UNDER CCP 664.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • at 08:35 AM in Department S27; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • at 08:35 am in Department SOS27, Ross Klein, Presiding; Exparte proceeding (1- EX PARTE APP FOR AN ORDERCONTINUING THE 9-26-16 TRIALAND RELATED DATES ; IN THE ALTTO SHORTEN TIME( M/P D JENN MILLAN )) - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Declaration (PLNTF- BLANCO 8-31-16 EX PARTE DECL OF RYAN BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO DEFT. JENNIFER MILLAN'S EXPARTE APP TO CONT TRIAL AND REOPEN DISCOVERY); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP, ETC. P.S. JENNIFER MILLAN AKA JENN MIL LAN, INDIV DBA SWEET EMBELLISHMENT S DIVI SERVED SAME 8-17-15 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department SOS26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Case is reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Challange (PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICE 170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Challenge; Filed by AN RYAN M. BLANCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by AN RYAN M. BLANCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Summons; Filed by AN RYAN M. BLANCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Summons; Filed by AN RYAN M. BLANCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less