This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 10:47:36 (UTC).

RUDEEN PARKS VS. PARKING CONCEPTS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2009 RUDEEN PARKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARKING CONCEPTS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROY L. PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3006

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROY L. PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKS RUDEEN

Defendants

TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS INC.

GODOY ADRIANA

PARKING CONCEPTS INC.

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Intervenors

LOS ANGELES CITY OF(BOARD OF HARBOR COMM

LOS ANGELES CITY OFBOARD OF HARBOR COMM

Not Classified By Court

WEISS LAWRENCE J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROCKETT THOMAS E. III

DIXON & DALEY

Intervenor and Defendant Attorneys

TRUTANICH CARMEN A.

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • DocketRefund of Jury Fees; Filed by PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant); ADRIANA GODOY (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by LOS ANGELES, CITY OF(BOARD OF HARBOR COMM (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant); MILLARD ,HOLWEGER, CHILD & MARTON (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by LOS ANGELES, CITY OF(BOARD OF HARBOR COMM (Legacy Party); PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant); ADRIANA GODOY (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv.; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant); MILLARD ,HOLWEGER, CHILD & MARTON (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. (Defendant); TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS,INC. (Defendant); MILLARD ,HOLWEGER, CHILD & MARTON (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RUDEEN PARKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKING CONCEPTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROCKETT THOMAS E III