This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2023 at 17:17:04 (UTC).

RUBID OCEGUEDA VS SONY ELECTRONICS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 RUBID OCEGUEDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SONY ELECTRONICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0838

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCEGUEDA RUBID

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION

Defendants

NGROUP INC.

SONY ELECTRONICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BISH MINDY SUSAN ESQ.

DORMAN JEFFREY HOWARD ESQ.

ZAVIDOW ROBERT MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

AV SANDRA ESQ.

ESCALANTE STANLEY RATCLIFFE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...) OF 10/25/2019

10/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...) OF 10/25/2019

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - UNCONDITIONA...)

Minute Order -

1/31/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/20/2018: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, INITIAL TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

6/6/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, INITIAL TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20 2018 TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

6/6/2018: PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20 2018 TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order -

6/6/2018: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

6/6/2018: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS. INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, INITIAL TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS. INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE JUNE 20, 2018, INITIAL TRIAL DATE FOR 90 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/16/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20 2018 TRIAL FOR A MINIMUM OF 120 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

8/31/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20 2018 TRIAL FOR A MINIMUM OF 120 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20 2018 TRIAL DATE FOR A MINIMUM OF 120 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

8/31/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20 2018 TRIAL DATE FOR A MINIMUM OF 120 DAYS FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order -

8/31/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20, 2018, TRIAL DATE FOR 120 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS NGROUP, INC. AND SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE SEPTEMBER 20, 2018, TRIAL DATE FOR 120 DAYS, FOR ALL PURPOSES

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RUBID OCEGUEDA on 08/17/2016, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditiona...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditiona...) of 10/25/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 01/29/2019 - scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RUBID OCEGUEDA on 08/17/2016, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION as to FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION , Ngroup, Inc. , and Sony Electronics

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rubid Ocegueda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 01/29/2019 - scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditiona...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 01/29/2019 - scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/25/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 01/29/2019 - scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-10-25 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Motion for Leave Michelle Williams Court 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketCalendaring:Motion for Leave 10/25/16 at 1:30 pm Michelle Williams Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketDocument:Motion for Leave Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 01/17/19 at 10:00 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 01/31/19 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less