This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:45:36 (UTC).

RTMH, INC. VS FH DISTRIBUTORS, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 01/04/2016 RTMH, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FH DISTRIBUTORS, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5205

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTMH INC.

Defendants

NASA INVESTMENTS INC.

AKHTARZAD SINA

THE NASA GROUP

SAD SINA

THE NASA MANAGEMENT GROUP

FH DISTRIBUTORS

Other

IAN J. SINGER ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMENTA M. CRIS

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL S. DRUCKER

IAN J. SINGER ESQ.

DRUCKER MICHAEL S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Motion to Strike (AND/OR TAX COSTS) - Off-Calendar-Request-Moving Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; (Motion to Strike; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion For Attorney Fees; Motion Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Motion For Attorney Fees - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Opposition; Filed by FH Distributors, (Defendant); Sina Sad (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO STRIKE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Reply to Opposition (TO MTN FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Reply to Opposition; Filed by FH Distributors, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Motion (FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $17,237.50 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department N; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Ex-Parte Application (FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER &FOR AN OSC RE: PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION) - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by RTMH, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Order (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by RTMH, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less