Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2016 at 14:23:03 (UTC).

RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS VS. CULP CONSTRUCTION CO.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2008 RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY THORNTON HOUSE and BOB T. HIGHT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7268

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

BOB T. HIGHT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

CHEN JOHNNY Y.

ROES 1-250

KOMORI AKIKO

STIFF RENEE F.

MCCURY DEBRA

TOAETOLU BENNETT

ELLIS LINDA

ALICANTE COMMUNITY CORP.

STIFF LEE

HO KOK H.

CHOPRA SABINA

ELLIS LEE

HIGDON LORI

MUNOZ ROBERT

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

MANCHESTER & BELFORD INVESTORS LLC

DOES 1-200

INTRACORP LOS ANGELES LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSI

CURTIS KENNETH W.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COX CASTLE & NICHOLSON LAW OFFICES OF

BARRY GARDNER & KINCANNON

ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS

COX CASTLE AND NICHOLSON

COTTONE EDWIN R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

COTTONE EDWIN R.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR : (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

5/2/2008: COMPLAINT FOR : (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/13/2008: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ANSWER OF CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2008: ANSWER OF CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/23/2008: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST -CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

6/5/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST -CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/2/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT BINU VAIDYANS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/11/2008: CROSS-DEFENDANT BINU VAIDYANS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT SABINA CHOPRAS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/11/2008: CROSS-DEFENDANT SABINA CHOPRAS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION OF RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS TO DEMURRER OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

7/29/2008: OPPOSITION OF RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS TO DEMURRER OF MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

Minute Order

9/18/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/3/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/3/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2009
  • Notice (OF X-DEFTS' WITHDRAWAL OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs ($2,560.00 STIP. TO WITHDRAW MEMORANDA OF COS TS AND ORDER 3/11/09 MEMO PLACE IN COURT FILE 3/26/09 VOL 2 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 5/23/08 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • Opposition ( TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • Opposition Document (TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2008
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: AKIKO KOMORI ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2008
  • Summons Filed ( ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: INTRACORP LOS ANGELES, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: MANCHESTER & BELFORD, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: MANCHESTER & BELFORD INVESTORS, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTRACORP LOS ANGELES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Professional Cabinet Solutions, a California corporation is a litigant