This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 01:35:18 (UTC).

ROZANNA AVETYAN VS CITIMORTGAGE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2012 ROZANNA AVETYAN filed an Other lawsuit against CITIMORTGAGE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7912

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVETYAN ROZANNA

Defendants

CITIMORTGAGE INC

CR TITLE SERVICES INC.

MERS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ASCHERIN PRESTON K.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

7/9/2012: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

7/10/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

7/11/2012: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

SUMMONS -

7/20/2012: SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/20/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

9/7/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY

9/10/2012: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINT1FFS COMPLAINT

10/5/2012: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINT1FFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR?I? THEREOF

10/5/2012: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR?I? THEREOF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/22/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 28, 2012

11/6/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 28, 2012

MINUTE ORDER

11/6/2012: MINUTE ORDER

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AND NOTICE OF: (1) NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT, ETC

11/20/2012: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AND NOTICE OF: (1) NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT, ETC

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ROZANNA AVETYAN? S NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE BK COURT?S DISMISSAL HAS BEEN FILED IN U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT OF CALIFORNIA)- THIS COURT LACK OF JURSIDICATION OF THAT SUBJECT MATTER THER

11/26/2012: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ROZANNA AVETYAN? S NOTICE OF APPEAL OF THE BK COURT?S DISMISSAL HAS BEEN FILED IN U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT OF CALIFORNIA)- THIS COURT LACK OF JURSIDICATION OF THAT SUBJECT MATTER THER

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

11/28/2012: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

11/28/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

MINUTE ORDER

11/28/2012: MINUTE ORDER

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-01-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Docketat 1:31 PM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-12-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS CITIMORTGAGE, INC., CR TITLE SERVICES, INC. AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Rozanna Avetyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rozanna Avetyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Rozanna Avetyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CR TITLE SERVICES CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASCHERIN PRESTON K