Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 18:19:30 (UTC).

ROXANA MARITZA OLIVA VS GONZALO LAZARO

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 ROXANA MARITZA OLIVA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GONZALO LAZARO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7119

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

OLIVA ROXANA MARITZA

OLIVIA ROXANNA MARITZA

Defendants and Respondents

LAZARO GONZALO

DOES 1 TO 150

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

10/12/2016: Unknown

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/17/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/17/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

12/20/2016: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

Minute Order

12/20/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62; (OSC - No Return of Service; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Gonzalo Lazaro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less