This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:25:50 (UTC).

ROSEMARY THOMPSON VS O C INTERIOR SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 ROSEMARY THOMPSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against O C INTERIOR SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7078

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON ROSEMARY

Defendants and Respondents

RICHARDSON LOUISE LORENE

DOES 1 TO 10

THOMPSON DOLORES

O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES L.L.C.

BASKEZ ARMONDO

LIVINGSTON DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON JULIUS ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

STEWART JULIAS ESQ.

MIRHOSSEINI ALI R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/13/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/10/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

4/4/2016: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

4/4/2016: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

Unknown

7/21/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/22/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S NOTICE OF FAILURE TO OPPOSE DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/29/2016: DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S NOTICE OF FAILURE TO OPPOSE DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS LOUISE LORENE RICHARDSON AND DOLORES THOMPSON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION; ETC

1/19/2017: DEFENDANTS LOUISE LORENE RICHARDSON AND DOLORES THOMPSON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION; ETC

Minute Order

1/30/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING:

2/15/2017: NOTICE OF RULING:

VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE BY ADVERSE POSSESSION; ETC

2/16/2017: VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE BY ADVERSE POSSESSION; ETC

SECOND AMENDED SUMMONS

2/16/2017: SECOND AMENDED SUMMONS

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/10/2017: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/14/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE

3/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

MINUTE ORDER

4/28/2017: MINUTE ORDER

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/16/2017: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Louise Lorene Richardson (Defendant); Dolores Thompson (Defendant); Dolores Livingston (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 32; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND [CODE CIV. PROC., 581, SUBD. (1)(2)I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Rosemary Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAIMNG ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE BY ADVERSE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Rosemary Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LAW OFFICES OF MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES

1502 N. Broadway Supertor © ?,“f’}f,’s‘f:g‘i'&f“‘“ Santa Ana, CA 92706 , : Telephone: (714)560-9100 MAR 10 2017 Facsimile: (714)560-9120 . ’ ST | by_ellpdll] gy Do

Attorney for Defendants, O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC. AND ARMONDO VASEQUEZ (erroneously sued as

ARMONDO BASKEZ) ' RECDY SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FEB 2 1 2017 FILING WIN COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES- CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER D W

) Case No.: BC 607078

ROSEMARY THOMPSON, ) Plaintiff, ' )

) RROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF

vs. ) DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF

DEFENDANT O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, O.C. INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC., a Limited) LLC’S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S Liability Corporation; ARMANDO BASKEZ, ) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT an individual, LOUISE LORENE ) | ’]/ RICHARDSON, an individual, DOLORES ) /)? THOMPSON aka DOLORES LIVINGSTON, ) an individual, and All Persons Claiming Any ) Complaint Filed: April 4, 2016 Legal or Equitable Property Described in the ) Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff’s Title, or Any ) Cloud On Plaintiffs Title Thereto AND DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE;

Defendants

BY Fax

AND ALL RELATED CROSS- ACTIONS

N’ e’

The Court on January 6, 2017, having sustained Defendant O.C. Interior Services LLC’s Demurrer to Plaintiff Rosemary Thompson’s First Amended Complaint filed in the above entitled action, and g.ranting 30 days, or until February 10, 2017 for Plaintiff to amend her First Amended Complaint, which Plaintiff has failed to do, and having ordered that Plaintiff's failure in filing an

[PROPOSED| JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL