This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 18:10:49 (UTC).

ROSE KELLER VS MIRIAM MACKOVIE-BASIC

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ROSE KELLER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MIRIAM MACKOVIE-BASIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8594

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSE KELLER

KELLER ROSE

Defendants

DOES 1-50

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

MIRIAM MACKOVIC-BASIC M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD N. MORRIS

MORRIS EDWARD N.

Defendant Attorneys

ANGELA S. HASKINS

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOL

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/8/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

9/12/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/4/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/11/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/29/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT MIRIAM MACKOVICBASIC, M.D.

5/10/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT MIRIAM MACKOVICBASIC, M.D.

DEFENDANT LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER?S ANSWER TO PLAINEIIFF?S COMPLAINT

5/9/2013: DEFENDANT LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER?S ANSWER TO PLAINEIIFF?S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

4/22/2013: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department LA93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Case Previously Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (as to Long Beach Memorial Medical Center ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by M.D. DISMISSED MIRIAM MACKOVIC-BASIC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv. - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROSE KELLER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASKINS ANGELA