This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2020 at 12:49:17 (UTC).

ROSA PENA DE MOLINA ET AL VS DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 ROSA PENA DE MOLINA filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 100. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1416

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Guardian Ad Litems, Decedents and Appellants

DE MOLINA ROSA PENA

MOLINA OSCAR

MOLINA ROSA PENA DE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

C.R. LAURENCE CO. INC. [DOE 2]

VELUX AMERICA LLC [DOE 30]

THYSSENKRUPP MATERIALS NA INC. [DOE 3]

CARDINAL GLASS INDUSTRIES INC. [DOE 13]

PRL GLASS SYSTEMS INC. [DOE 25]

OLDCASTLE BUILDING ENVELOPE INC. DOE 22

WESTERN STATES GLASS INC. [DOE 31]

UNIVERSAL MOLDING COMPANY [DOE 29]

AVALON GLASS & MIRROR COMPANY [DOE 12]

HOSKINGS & MUIR INC. [DOE 17]

VITRO FLAT GLASS LLC [DOE 9]

GLASPRO

TRIVIEW GLASS INDUSTRIES LLC [DOE 27]

GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES LLC [DOE 16]

Minors

MOLINA DINA

PENA ARNOLD MOLINA

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

METZGER LAW GROUP APLC

PARISER ABRAHAM I.

Defendant Attorneys

VAN KORLAAR ADAM B.

ALEXANDER JILLIAN NOELLE

JILIZIAN NAYRI

KIM GREGORY

MANNING KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

GRACCO CHRISTINE JOY

LYNBERG & WATKINS APC

MATIN AURIEL

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

MUENCH RICHARD A

RASMUSSEN PAUL DAVID

BENKNER JASON ARTHUR

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

GRAMLING KEVIN JOSEPH

VOLFSON YEVGENIYA

BENLER-WARD ERIN LINDSEY

Other Attorneys

HATCH DAVID E

EVERETT DOREY LLP

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER GRANTING MSJ - PRL GLASS SYSTEMS, INC & PRL ALUMINUM, INC.

8/12/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING MSJ - PRL GLASS SYSTEMS, INC & PRL ALUMINUM, INC.

Order - ORDER GRANTING MSJ - GLASSWERKS LA, INC.

8/12/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING MSJ - GLASSWERKS LA, INC.

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE AS TO VIENNA NGUYEN, #13137

8/12/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE AS TO VIENNA NGUYEN, #13137

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER AS TO INGRID SARACIONE, #11960

8/13/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER AS TO INGRID SARACIONE, #11960

Response - RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/14/2019: Response - RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Notice of Ruling

8/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

8/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT LIBERTY GLASS FABRICATORS, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS

8/14/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT LIBERTY GLASS FABRICATORS, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF LIBERTY GLASS' EX PARTE APPL TO COMPEL DEPOS OF PLTFS' EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF PLTFS' EXPERTS; DECL OF LAURA E. GOOLSBY

8/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF LIBERTY GLASS' EX PARTE APPL TO COMPEL DEPOS OF PLTFS' EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF PLTFS' EXPERTS; DECL OF LAURA E. GOOLSBY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFT GLASPRO; RULING...)

8/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFT GLASPRO; RULING...)

Response - RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

8/15/2019: Response - RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Order - ORDER GRANTING PILKINGTON'S MSJ

8/15/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING PILKINGTON'S MSJ

Order - ORDER DENYING LIBERTY'S MSJ

8/15/2019: Order - ORDER DENYING LIBERTY'S MSJ

Order - ORDER GRANTING GLASPRO'S MSJ

8/15/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING GLASPRO'S MSJ

Opposition - OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT LIBERTY GLASS FABRICATORS, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS

8/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANT LIBERTY GLASS FABRICATORS, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS ...)

8/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL

8/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM AMENDED

8/16/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM AMENDED

612 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • Hearing01/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketResponse (Response to OSC re Dismissal); Filed by Rosa Pena De Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Vitro Flat Glass LLC [DOE 9] (Defendant); PPG INDUSTRIES,INC, A DEL. CORP. (DOE 33) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Vitro Flat Glass LLC [DOE 9] (Defendant); PPG INDUSTRIES,INC, A DEL. CORP. (DOE 33) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to deft PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. ONLY); Filed by Rosa Pena De Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Defendant VITRO FLAT GLASS LLC, ONLY); Filed by Rosa Pena De Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Signed Order Granting Defendant AGC Flat Glass North AMerica, Inc.'s Good Faith Settlement Application); Filed by ACG Flat Glass No. America, Inc. [DOE11] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Rosa Pena De Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA 10/8/19 B301736); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
998 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDERS ENTERED AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD JUNE 14, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department 36; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TOXIC INJURIES ASSERTING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Pena De Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIVIEW GLASS INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Avalon Glass and Mirror Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Guardian Industries Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARDINAL GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; ESA : CARDINAL GLASS INDUSTRIES is a litigant