This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2017 at 22:01:27 (UTC).

ROSA ARTEAGA ET AL VS JAMBA JUICE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2014 ROSA ARTEAGA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JAMBA JUICE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4304

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARTEAGA ROSA

GLOVER JESSICA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

JAMBA JUICE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GLICK STEPHEN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DLA PIPER US LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/23/2016: Minute Order

SUMMONS

11/19/2014: SUMMONS

Stipulation

10/31/2017: Stipulation

Minute Order

3/16/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/31/2017: Minute Order

Other -

6/26/2017: Other -

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

11/23/2016: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Other -

10/5/2016: Other -

Status Report

7/24/2017: Status Report

Status Report

1/9/2017: Status Report

Civil Deposit

6/23/2017: Civil Deposit

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/31/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/12/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

1/12/2017: Minute Order

Other -

1/24/2017: Other -

Status Report

10/5/2016: Status Report

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/16/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

3/16/2017: Notice of Ruling

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CASE ANYWHERE POSTING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (ROSIE SAMPLES CSR 12383 909-252-7351 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT STATUS REPORT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Stip & Order-use CSR (KEVIN ROLDAN CSR 13463 951-283-1337 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CASE ANYWHERE POSTING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Order (joint status report conformed copy mailed) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CASE ANYWHERE POSTING ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Order ( conformed copy mailed) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT STATUS REPORT [PROPOSED ORDER] TO CONTINUE SUBMITTED TO COURT ) Filed by Court Attendant

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2015
  • Order (re online legal case management and e-service provider conformed copy mailed) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (RE: ORDER RE ONLINE LEGAL CASE MANAGMENT AND E-SERVICE PROVIDER RECEIVED AND SUBMITTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Stip & Order-use CSR (MARCELINE NOBLE CSR 3024 noblescr@aol.com ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Notice (complex paid ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Report-Status Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: ROSA JAMBA JUICE CO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Order (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less