This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:08:00 (UTC).

RONNIE POTEL VS PACIFIC FIRST NATIONAL INC.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 RONNIE POTEL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PACIFIC FIRST NATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4183

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

POTEL RONNIE

ABEKASIS ARIE

SILVER BRENT MICHAEL

Defendants

PACIFIC FIRST NATIONAL INC.

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMINTY COMPANY

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC.

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC.

COMERICA BANK

RICKI ALON TRUSTEE OF THE RICKI ALON TST

363 N SWEETZER AVE LLC

Others

BLACKHURST WHITNEY R.

HILBERT JOHN FOREST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LANDVER ALINA

ANDERSON HILBERT & PARKER

LAW OFFICES OF LESLIE RICHARDS A.P.C.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LESLIE RICHARDS A.P.C.

ABDULAZIZ GROSSBART & RUDMAN

BLACKHURST WHITNEY R.

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Pacific First National Inc. (Defendant); Pacifica First National Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by 363 N Sweetzer Ave, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • at 09:02 AM in Department N; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • at 09:02 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal (RE SETTLEMENT:) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NTC OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Ronnie Potel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (X-COMPLAINT FILED BY *PACIFICA 1ST NAT'L, INC. A CALIF CORP ON 1-20-16 *AS TO PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL, INC., A CALIF. CORP'S X-COMPLAINT ONLY); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Pacific First National Inc. (Defendant); Pacifica First National Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Ronnie Potel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Ronnie Potel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Notice of Pendency (OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS). ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ronnie Potel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Notice of Pendency; Filed by Ronnie Potel (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Comerica Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant