This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 00:48:20 (UTC).

RONNIE ALTON PUTMAN ET AL VS ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC ET

Case Summary

On 12/17/2009 RONNIE ALTON PUTMAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, RAMONA G. SEE and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8137

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

RAMONA G. SEE

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PUTMAN GENEVA MAE

PUTMAN RONNIE ALTON

Defendants and Respondents

ADVANCE AUTO PARTS

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

ASCO VALVE INC./DOE 2

ATWOOD & MORRILL

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC.

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC INC.

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CBS CORPORATION

CLA-VAL CO.

CRANE CO.

CRANE CO. SUCCESSOR-IN-INTERERST TO JENK

DANA COMPANIES L.L.C.

DAP INC.

DOES 1-450

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY

FMC CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES L.L.C.

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EDDINS RON C. ESQ.

GAMBLE TYSON B.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LOW BALL & LYNCH

NICHOLS STEPHEN M. ESQ.

MITCHEL STEVEN M. ESQ.

JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

JACKSON GABRIEL A. ESQ.

DAVIS GEOFFREY M. ESQ.

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

KANNETT MARK S. ESQ.

K&L GATES LLP

BIDERMAN DAVID T. ESQ.

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

FOLEY & MASNSFIELD P.L.L.P

GLASPY & GLASPY INC. LAW OFFICES OF

PALMIERI TYLER WIENER WILEHLM WALDRON

POND NORTH LLP

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD ET AL

HAWKINS PARNELL & THACKSTON LLP

HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

32 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (CCP SECTION 170.6)

12/23/2009: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (CCP SECTION 170.6)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (RE: JURY DEPOSIT POSTED BYPLAINTIFF(CCH#465980047, $150, 8/11/11)) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • Docketat 09:50 am in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (DAP INC. ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (YARWAY CORPORATION ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
283 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (CLA VAL CO'S ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • Docketin Department 1, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding; Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Transferred to different departmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (BORG WARNER CORPORATION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 JUDGE STERN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCO VALVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCE AUTO PARTS is a litigant