This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:07:32 (UTC).

RONALD X. LEWIS VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 RONALD X LEWIS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8550

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS RONALD X

Defendants

ARNOLD ERIC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SOLANO PRISON

SEC. OF ADULT OPERTION

WARDEN

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

VIERA ROSA GUILLERMO CHAIRPERSON

BOARD OF PAROLE HEARINGS

SCOTT KERNAN DIRECTOR OF CORRECTIONS

BROWN EDUMND G. GOVERNOR

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS &

PRISON SOLANO

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COLIN ANDRIS SHAFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • Remittitur filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice (NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL (APPELLANT) ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal (AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL. ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by RONALD X LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by RONALD X LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record (APPLELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by RONALD X LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by RONALD X LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by RONALD X LEWIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request-Waive Addl Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL FEE WAIVER ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Request-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less