This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:00:06 (UTC).

RODULFO PALACIO ET AL VS BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/24/2016 RODULFO PALACIO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5159

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

PALACIO ILUMINADA

PALACIO RUDULFO

RODULFO PALACIO

Respondents and Defendants

HACRONS & CROSFIELD (PACIFC) INC.

VIACOM INC.

CBS CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES INC.

FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE INC.

HACRONS & CROSFIELD PACIFC INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PFIZER INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA & IND

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.

ROBERT A. GREEN ESQ.

BENNO ASHRAFI ESQ.

VENUS BURNS ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT MENCHINI ESQ.

DOUGLAS WAH

JENNIFER FITZPATRICK

EDWARD MARTINOVICH ESQ.

HEATHER L. WEAKLEY ESQ.

KHALED TAQI-EDDIN

JERRY C. POPOVICH ESQ.

TAQI-EDDIN KHALED

WAH DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

1/5/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

MISCELLANEOUS

1/5/2016: MISCELLANEOUS

SUMMONS

6/24/2016: SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/5/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. JAMES DAHLGREN FROM OPINING AS A CERTIFIED INDUSTRIAL HYGIENIST

1/5/2017: DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT DR. JAMES DAHLGREN FROM OPINING AS A CERTIFIED INDUSTRIAL HYGIENIST

MISCELLANEOUS

1/6/2017: MISCELLANEOUS

Minute Order

1/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/11/2017: Minute Order

MISCELLANEOUS

1/11/2017: MISCELLANEOUS

TRIAL BRIEF RE THE ADMISSIBILITY OF CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL SAFETY ORDERS TO PROVE TRIPLE A'S DUTY TO PLAINTIFF RODULFO PALACIO

1/12/2017: TRIAL BRIEF RE THE ADMISSIBILITY OF CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL SAFETY ORDERS TO PROVE TRIPLE A'S DUTY TO PLAINTIFF RODULFO PALACIO

Minute Order

1/17/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2017: Minute Order

JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

1/19/2017: JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN

JURY REQUEST FORM

1/19/2017: JURY REQUEST FORM

Unknown

3/6/2017: Unknown

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rodulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Rudulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Iluminada Palacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rodulfo Palacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rodulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Rudulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Iluminada Palacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rodulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Iluminada Palacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Rodulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Rudulfo Palacio (Plaintiff); Iluminada Palacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MISCELLANEOUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELEMENTS CHEMICALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where J. T. THORPE & SON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRASERS BOILER SERVICES INC. is a litigant