This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:22:03 (UTC).

RODRIGO AGUILAR ET AL VS CTC GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 RODRIGO AGUILAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CTC GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3304

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AGUILAR RODRIGO

IBARRA MARIA

PEREZ GUADALUPE

Defendants and Respondents

FRANCO FRANCISCO

DOES 1-20

DOUBLETREE BY HILTON TORRANCE

FIRST RATE STAFFING CORPORATION

LOPEZ ROSALVA

CTC GROUP

RECANA LLC

TORRANCE DOUBLETREE BY HILTON

Other

KOUL LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SROURIAN LAW FIRM

FIRM KOUL LAW

FIRM SROURIAN LAW

FIRM SHAKOURI LAW

KOULLOKIAN NAZO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

CUMMINS & WHITE LLP

DONAHUE FITZGERALD LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Order

4/2/2018: Order

Other -

4/16/2018: Other -

Minute Order

5/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/20/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

7/23/2018: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

12/8/2016: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [LABOR CODE 1198 & 510 EL SEQ.]; ETC

12/8/2016: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [LABOR CODE 1198 & 510 EL SEQ.]; ETC

Minute Order

1/10/2017: Minute Order

Status Report

1/10/2017: Status Report

Notice of Appearance

2/1/2017: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order

3/3/2017: Minute Order

Notice

3/3/2017: Notice

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2017: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

3/13/2017: Complaint

Answer

5/1/2017: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2017: Substitution of Attorney

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rodrigo Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CTC Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Rodrigo Aguilar (Plaintiff); Maria Ibarra (Plaintiff); Guadalupe Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • Status Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Notice of Appearance DEFENDANT CTC GROUP, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Notice; Filed by CTC Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Status Report INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Rodrigo Aguilar (Plaintiff); Maria Ibarra (Plaintiff); Guadalupe Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [LABOR CODE 1198 & 510 EL SEQ.]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less