This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 00:15:39 (UTC).

RODOLFO MUNOZ VS MARIA CHRISTINA MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 RODOLFO MUNOZ filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against MARIA CHRISTINA MUNOZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOWRY, STEPHEN M. and KLEEMAN, DENA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0303

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOWRY, STEPHEN M.

KLEEMAN, DENA A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MUNOZ RODOLFO

MUNOZ RUDOLFO

Respondent

MUNOZ MARIA CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (Rejected and sent via SASE on 9/11/17. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department M, Lowry, Stephen M., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Reply (Declaration of Maria Christina Munoz ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Responsive Declaration; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Declaration (of Diligence ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Proof of Service (UNSUCCESSFUL ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (DEFAULT PACKET RETURNED TO THE PET ITIONER IN SASE - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- Party Served: Respondent: Munoz, Maria ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Rejected on 2016-08-08 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (Srvd: Response to Petition - Party Served: Respondent: Munoz, Maria - Rejected on 2015-06-22 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Support (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Hearing Set on 2016-08-11 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Granted on 2016-06-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Granted on 2016-06-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Petition - Nullity w/o Minor Child (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Munoz, Rodolfo - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less