This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 14:24:57 (UTC).

ROBIN RUDISILL ET AL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 ROBIN RUDISILL filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7263

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KAPLAN SUE

RUDISILL ROBIN

Defendants and Respondents

DEPARTMENT OF CITY PLANNING OF THE CITY

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Interested Parties

BEVER FABIAN

DOES 1 TO 20

THIBODEAU ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

VENSKUS & ASSOCIATES P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

Interested Party Attorney

ALICA B. BARTLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

8/1/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

SUMMONS

8/28/2015: SUMMONS

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/28/2015: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

10/2/2015: ANSWER OF CITY OF LOS ANGELES

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

10/7/2015: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/14/2015: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR RELIEF

10/26/2015: MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR RELIEF

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

11/18/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/30/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF CITY'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

12/8/2015: NOTICE OF CITY'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

12/8/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

12/8/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order

12/17/2015: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER

12/17/2015: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER

Minute Order

1/5/2016: Minute Order

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR RELIEF

3/22/2016: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR RELIEF

Minute Order

3/29/2016: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2016
  • at 1:32 PM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Real Party in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • at 3:00 PM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Robin Rudisill (Plaintiff); Sue Kaplan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON REAL PARTIES IN INTERESTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Robin Rudisill (Plaintiff); Sue Kaplan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY