This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:01:06 (UTC).

ROBIN MICHELE SAVOIAN VS. ALEXANDER DRURY DALTAS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2016 ROBIN MICHELE SAVOIAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALEXANDER DRURY DALTAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEICHTER, ALEXANDRA, CATHCART, PATRICK A., SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT, LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT, TRABER, THERESA M., SEIGLE, LAURA A. and WILLETT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0302

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEICHTER, ALEXANDRA

CATHCART, PATRICK A.

SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

TRABER, THERESA M.

SEIGLE, LAURA A.

WILLETT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAVOIAN ROBIN MICHELE

Respondent

DALTAS ALEXANDER DRURY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVINSON MARK LYNN

Respondent Attorney

MIONI LOVETTE T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 87, Cathcart, Patrick A., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Judgment - Reserved Issues - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 87, Willett, Robert E, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 87, Seigle, Laura A., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 87, Seigle, Laura A., Presiding; Short Cause Trial - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- Filed By: Respondent: Daltas, Alexander ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- Filed By: Respondent: Daltas, Alexander ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-06-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Miscellaneous (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Summons (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- Filed By: Petitioner: Savoian, Robin ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MARK LYNN