This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2016 at 17:52:34 (UTC).

ROBIDOUX, EUGENE J. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/02/2013 ROBIDOUX, EUGENE J - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L. and STRATTON, MARIA E.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3895

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SWEARINGER BILL

SWEARINGER WILLIAM

Claimants

SOUTHERN CALIF GASTROENTEROLOGY

DIGESTIVE HEALTH CONSULTANTS INC.

NORTH VALLEY NURSING CENTER

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST.

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Decedent

ROBIDOUX EUGENE J.

Not Classified By Court

SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KOSLYN PAMELA ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • Order - Approving Account (Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Notice - Hearing (Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Supplement (Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Rejected 2015-11-02 SO. CA GASTROENTEROLOGY REJECTED: NOT TIMELY Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Inventory & Appraisal ($142,732.67 Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Inventory & Appraisal ($18,612.75 Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Withdrawal - Special Notice (Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Claimant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Proof of Service (Filed By: Swearinger, William, Petitioner Repres By: Koslyn, Pamela, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Receipt (WELLS FARGO BANK Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Claimant )

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2013
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (Filed By: Swearinger, Bill, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Order - Appointing Personal Representative (Full Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Executor Executor: Swearinger, Bill, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Stipulation - Judge Pro Tem (Filed by: Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Proof of Publication (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Supplement (Filed By: Swearinger, Bill, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Supplement (TO PETITION FOR PROBATE WILL AND ETC. Filed By: Swearinger, Bill, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Petitioner in Pro Per )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Will (Will Admitted 2013-09-05 Filed by: Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 09/05/2013 Filed By: Swearinger, Bill, Petitioner Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH VALLEY NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSLYN PAMELA ESQ.