This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 15:44:59 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX,LTD. VS. BANNAOUN ENGINEERS CONSTRUCT

Case Summary

On 04/11/2016 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX,LTD filed an Other lawsuit against BANNAOUN ENGINEERS CONSTRUCT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8418

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

BANNAOUN ENGINEERS CONSTRUCTORS CORPORATI

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

CITY OF LYNWOOD

OMAR G. MALOOF

MALOOF OMAR G.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MERVYN Y. ENCARNACION

Defendant Attorneys

TAFOYA & GARCIA LLP

TAPIA NOEL ESQ.

LOCKLEAR TINA THE LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEVELOPERS SURETY & INDEM- NITY COMPLANY ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by CITY OF LYNWOOD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice; Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice (OF OSC HEARING & REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Answer; Filed by CITY OF LYNWOOD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Notice; Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Notice (OF COMMENCEMENT OF PROCEEDING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD, A PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less