This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2019 at 01:57:18 (UTC).

ROBERTS, TOURE VS. ROBERTS, LORI

Case Summary

On 02/07/2014 ROBERTS, TOURE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERTS, LORI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEENY, VIRGINIA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7437

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEENY, VIRGINIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERTS TOURE

Respondent

ROBERTS LORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINDEMANN BLAKE J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (OUT/BLAKE LINDEMANN - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Robin J. Lozoya - On Behalf of: Respondent: Roberts, Lori - Filed and Entered on 2014-11-06 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • at 8:30 AM in Van Nuys East Dept. - J, Keeny, Virginia, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Support and Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Roberts, Lori - Filed and Entered on 2014-09-19 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure - Filed and Entered on 2014-09-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Roberts, Lori - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-07 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Roberts, Lori - Filed and Entered on 2014-05-13 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-15-14 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Roberts, Lori ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-03-14 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Roberts, Toure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDEMANN BLAKE J.