This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:45:02 (UTC).

ROBERTO MALDONADO VS. STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 ROBERTO MALDONADO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5279

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALDONADO ROBERTO

Defendants

STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS INC.

VILLA JOSE MANUEL

VILLA JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANDLER PAUL W. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Case Dismissed) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE FORPLTF'S F.T.A. ON 8/29/16) - Case Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Not Held-Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPER M/O 6/30/16) - Not Held-Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL FOR F.T.A. ON 5/16/16ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPER M/O 5/16/16) - OSC held & continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Not held-No appearances) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Not held-No appearances

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketStatement of Damages; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUB-SERVED STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS 1-25-16 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBERTO MALDONADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBERTO MALDONADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by ROBERTO MALDONADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by ROBERTO MALDONADO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less