This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 20:06:10 (UTC).

ROBERT TAKANASHI VS NORTON MOTORCYCLES INC

Case Summary

On 10/19/2016 ROBERT TAKANASHI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NORTON MOTORCYCLES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7845

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TAKANASHI ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

NORTON MOTORCYCLES INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BICKEL BRIAN J. ESQ.

BICKEL BRIAN JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

RENTTO ROBERT LEAVITT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

4/13/2018: DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Minute Order

4/18/2018: Minute Order

RULING

4/18/2018: RULING

THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT

4/25/2018: THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT

Ex Parte Application

12/26/2018: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

1/4/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/28/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service by Mail

2/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/28/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE FONSECA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/20/2017: DECLARATION OF MICHELLE FONSECA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/2/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF DANIEL BOWES IN SUPPORT OF (I) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ALTERNATIVELY, (2) MOTION TO INTERVENE

10/25/2017: DECLARATION OF DANIEL BOWES IN SUPPORT OF (I) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ALTERNATIVELY, (2) MOTION TO INTERVENE

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ALTERNATIVELY, (2) MOTION TO INTERVENE

10/25/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR ALTERNATIVELY, (2) MOTION TO INTERVENE

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/6/2017: Minute Order

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Motorcycles (UK) LTD. Erroneously Sued As Norton Motorcycles, Incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Motorcycles (UK) LTD. Erroneously Sued As Norton Motorcycles, Incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing - Other (on Plaintiff's 998 offer) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other on Plaintiff's 998 offer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Rescinding Plaintiffs 998 Offer); Filed by Robert Takanashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Motion for Order (Rescinding Plaintiff's 998 Offer); Filed by Robert Takanashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration (of Stephanie S. Pengilley in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Rescind Plaintiff's 998 Offer); Filed by Robert Takanashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Motorcycles (UK) LTD. Erroneously Sued As Norton Motorcycles, Incorporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS CODE 2111(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-12-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SONG-BEVERLY CONSUMER WARRANTY ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Robert Takanashi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC637845    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 19

Defendant's Motion to Strike/Tax Costs is CONTINUED TO November 21, 2019, 8:30 a.m.

The parties have failed to provide the Court (Department 19) with printed courtesy copies of all of the moving, opposition and reply papers, as required by the Los Angeles Superior Court - Mandatory Electronic Filing For Civil, General Order, and posted online for Department 19 – courtroom information link. The parties are ordered to comply and submit courtesy copies to Department 19 on or before November 8, 2019. Counsel for Defendant to give notice.