This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2016 at 15:30:49 (UTC).

ROBERT RODRIGUEZ VS KIKY LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2014 ROBERT RODRIGUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIKY LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT S. HARRISON and RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3210

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT S. HARRISON

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

HO ROBERT

LEE KIKY

LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC.

YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SZMANDA BRETT D

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BLOCK DENNIS P. ESQ.

GINDER ERIC R. ESQ.

MARSHALL WAYNE S. ESQ.

SAFARIAN HARRY A. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MARSHALL WAYNE S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES CAUSES OF ACTION: 1)FRAUD IN THE INDUCEMENT OF CONTRACT; ETC

7/30/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES CAUSES OF ACTION: 1)FRAUD IN THE INDUCEMENT OF CONTRACT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

FFCLARATION OF SAMUEL STEINER IN ,UPPORT OF NOTICE OF ERRATA ANI) CORRECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S PROOF F SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LONG LRAGON REALTY GROUP, INC. AND TO F?LAINTIFF?S REQ

11/26/2014: FFCLARATION OF SAMUEL STEINER IN ,UPPORT OF NOTICE OF ERRATA ANI) CORRECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S PROOF F SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT LONG LRAGON REALTY GROUP, INC. AND TO F?LAINTIFF?S REQ

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

1/21/2015: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Unknown

1/26/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

3/18/2015: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

DECLARATION OF BRETT SZMANDA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTION

3/23/2015: DECLARATION OF BRETT SZMANDA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER WITHDRAWING ADMISSIONS RE FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; ETC.

4/27/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER WITHDRAWING ADMISSIONS RE FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; ETC.

TENTATIVE RULING

4/29/2015: TENTATIVE RULING

Minute Order

5/14/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

5/18/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/19/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/16/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/4/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/2/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT RODRIGUEZ FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/12/2015: CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT RODRIGUEZ FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Proof of Service

11/17/2015: Proof of Service

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (RECOVERING $10,000 OR MORE IN VALUE "BOX" CHECKED OFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO Long Dragon Realty Group, In c. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUJJMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Order (MOTION RULING FOR 12/2/15 ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR LONG- #5.28. FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (TWO FILED THIS DATE SEPARATELY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Request for Certified Copy Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver After Hrg Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL WAYNE STANTON