This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 14:46:13 (UTC).

ROBERT RICHARD VS MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION ET A

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 ROBERT RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, VALERIE SALKIN, VIRGINIA KEENY and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8048

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

VALERIE SALKIN

VIRGINIA KEENY

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Appellant, Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner

RICHARD ROBERT

Appellants, Defendants, Respondents and Petitioners

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

RICHARD ROBERT

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

DOES 1-10

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANORAMA CITY LLC

GESSESSE HIRUY HAIL M.D. DOE 1

COLE PEDROZA LLP

Defendants, Respondents, Appellants and Petitioners

DOES 1-10

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

RICHARD ROBERT

DEANCO HEALTHCARE PANORAMA CITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TRAYLOR MICHAEL S. ESQ.

TRAYLOR MICHAEL STEVEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ENDELICATO CONSTANCE A. ESQ.

ENDELICATO CONSTANCE ANN

JACOBSEN ZENA

KJAR JAMES JORGEN

LYNCH GREGORY GORDON

 

Court Documents

Judgment on Special Verdict

3/13/2020: Judgment on Special Verdict

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/13/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

6/10/2019: Judgment

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B306203

6/7/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B306203

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 06/04/20-U B306203

4/2/2021: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 06/04/20-U B306203

Memorandum of Costs on Appeal - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

3/16/2021: Memorandum of Costs on Appeal - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B299128

2/3/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B299128

Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal - CLERK'S NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL NOA: 06/04/20 B306203

1/21/2021: Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal - CLERK'S NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL NOA: 06/04/20 B306203

Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 - NOTICE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) "X"

11/18/2020: Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 - NOTICE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) "X"

Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal - APPEAL - CLERK'S NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL NOA: 06/30/20-X B306203

11/18/2020: Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal - APPEAL - CLERK'S NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL NOA: 06/30/20-X B306203

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"

11/2/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/15/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR REJECTION 10/13/2020 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR REJECTION 10/13/2020 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Notice of Settlement

9/16/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

9/16/2020: Notice of Settlement

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X"

7/29/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X"

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"

7/28/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"

277 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B306203); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 06/04/20-U B306203); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference (/Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by Hiruy Hail Gessesse, M.D. (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B299128); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA: 06/04/20 B306203); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 ("X"); Filed by Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Appellant); Mission Community Hospital (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA: 06/30/20-X B306203); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Default ("U"); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
389 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ASSAULT AND SEXUAL ASSAULT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint (VOIDED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • DocketReply to Opposition; Filed by Mission Community Hospital (Defendant); Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less