This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2016 at 08:45:51 (UTC).

ROBERT R. JIMENEZ VS CHRISTOPHER L. SHEPARD

Case Summary

On 08/06/2014 ROBERT R JIMENEZ filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER L SHEPARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7054

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JIMENEZ ROBERT R

JIMENEZ ROBERT R.

Defendants

NATIONWIDE CAPITAL GROUP INC

SHEPARD CHRISTOPHER L

SHEPARD INVESTMENT INC

SHEPARD INVESTMENT INC.

NATIONWIDE CAPITAL GROUP INC.

SHEPARD CHRISTOPHER L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ARIAS ESQ. CARL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Opposition ( to the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • Reply To Motion (to the plaintiff's opposition to the defendants' demurrer to the complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Reply To Motion (in opp to defendants' demurrer ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Response (AMENDED RESPONSE TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Response (TO PETITION TO VACATE THE ARB JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Request-Trial de Novo (AFTER JUDICIAL ARBITRATION ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Summons Filed (& ISSUED ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE CAPITAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS CARL BERNARD