This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:45:33 (UTC).

ROBERT LEE GIPSON VS CINDY CASTRO MONTANEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2016 ROBERT LEE GIPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CINDY CASTRO MONTANEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8862

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GIPSON ROBERT LEE

Defendants and Respondents

MONTANEZ CINDY CASTRO

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

CASTRO KATHY

Other

SHAFFER DOUGLAS D. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.

SHAFFER DOUGLAS D. ESQ.

MARRERO GUILLERMO ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BRAYBROOKE SCOTT E. ESQ.

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND VACATE FSC AND TRAIL DATES;AND ETC.

4/4/2018: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND VACATE FSC AND TRAIL DATES;AND ETC.

Declaration

6/11/2018: Declaration

NOTICE OF RULING

7/11/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

11/1/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/1/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/2/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/2/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

4/27/2016: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

7/10/2017: Unknown

Motion to Compel

8/28/2017: Motion to Compel

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

10/16/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/19/2017: Minute Order

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Cindy Castro Montanez (Defendant); Kathy Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Status of Liquidation Proceedings of Access General Insurance Company - Insurer for Defendants (Liquidation in Travis County , Texas) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Status of Liquidation Proceedings of A...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Declaration (of Counsel Re: Case Status); Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Declaration (of Counsel re: Case Status); Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Counsel re: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal); Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Cindy Castro Montanez (Defendant); Kathy Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Robert Lee Gipson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC608862    Hearing Date: December 27, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Bryan M. Garrie, Guillermo Marrero, Donald Kottler, and Douglas Kottler seek to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Robert Lee Gipson on the grounds that there has been an irreconcilable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Trial is in one month, and this case is almost four years old. Accordingly, this Motion to be relieved is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.