This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 01:14:02 (UTC).

ROBERT HEAP VS WESTIN AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 ROBERT HEAP filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WESTIN AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3277

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HEAP ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

WEST ROBERT

WESTIN AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KRAKOW MARVIN E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HENLEY WILLIAM K. ESQ.

HENLEY WILLIAM K.ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/9/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. AGE DISCRIMINATION UNDER THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT ("FEHA") (GOV. CODE ?12940 ET SEQ) ;ETC

12/9/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. AGE DISCRIMINATION UNDER THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT ("FEHA") (GOV. CODE ?12940 ET SEQ) ;ETC

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFRCER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

12/14/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFRCER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

12/19/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

12/20/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO HON. ELIZABETH WHITE, DEPT. 48

1/13/2017: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO HON. ELIZABETH WHITE, DEPT. 48

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

1/17/2017: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Unknown

1/24/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS WESTIN AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS, INC. AND ROBERT WEST'S ANSWER TO COMPLIAINT

2/15/2017: DEFENDANTS WESTIN AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS, INC. AND ROBERT WEST'S ANSWER TO COMPLIAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2017

3/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2017

Unknown

4/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/4/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/19/2017: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/25/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

5/25/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/19/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/19/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL OF PAGA CLAIM; REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL

10/19/2017: STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL OF PAGA CLAIM; REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Heap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL OF PAGA CLAIM; REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Stipulation; Filed by Robert Heap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL OF PAGA CLAIM; ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Robert Heap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Robert Heap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFRCER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. AGE DISCRIMINATION UNDER THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT ("FEHA") (GOV. CODE 12940 ET SEQ) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Robert Heap (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENLEY WILLIAM K.