This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 14:24:28 (UTC).

ROBERT HALL VS. DOUGLAS JAMES WESTHOFF, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2012 ROBERT HALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOUGLAS JAMES WESTHOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, CARY NISHIMOTO, ADR NEUTRAL, STUART M. RICE, ELIA WEINBACH and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7163

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

CARY NISHIMOTO

ADR NEUTRAL

STUART M. RICE

ELIA WEINBACH

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL ROBERT

Defendants

WESTHOFF DOUGLAS JAMES

WESTOFF INVESTMENTS

WESTOFF TRUST

Not Classified By Court

BENCE DAVID R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISSNER WERNER LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

WEBB SHARON K.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

5/17/2013: Unknown

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/24/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR CLAIMS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PR

5/24/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR CLAIMS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PR

DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT ACCIDENTS OR INJURIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ

5/31/2013: DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT ACCIDENTS OR INJURIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ

DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AND EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL LIEN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K.

5/31/2013: DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AND EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL LIEN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K.

PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT ACCIDENTS OR INJURIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF WERNER R. MEISSNER; [PROPOS

6/11/2013: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR AND SUBSEQUENT ACCIDENTS OR INJURIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF WERNER R. MEISSNER; [PROPOS

PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE BEEN REFERRED TO A DOCTOR BY AN ATTORNEY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WERNER R MEISSNER; [PROPOSED] O

6/11/2013: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE BEEN REFERRED TO A DOCTOR BY AN ATTORNEY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WERNER R MEISSNER; [PROPOSED] O

PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AND EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL LIEN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/11/2013: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS AND EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL LIEN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL CONDUCT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/14/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL CONDUCT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

ORDER

6/14/2013: ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE?#4 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF DEFENDANT?S ATTORNEY BACKGROUND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/14/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE?#4 TO EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF DEFENDANT?S ATTORNEY BACKGROUND; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE LIABILITY EXPERT FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF DON J RICHARDS

6/14/2013: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE LIABILITY EXPERT FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF DON J RICHARDS

DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO SHIFT THE BURDEN OF PROOF: LIABILITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.

6/18/2013: DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO SHIFT THE BURDEN OF PROOF: LIABILITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.

DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE LIABILITY EXPERT FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.

6/18/2013: DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE LIABILITY EXPERT FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHARON K. WEBB, ESQ.

Minute Order

6/19/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/9/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/9/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/3/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT AND FILE REQUEST FOR; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Notice (OF TENTATIVE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Opposition (TO PLNTFS EXPARTE APP. TO EXCLUDE LIABILITY EXPERT FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Opposition (TO PLNTFS MTN IN LIM. #4 TO SHIFT THE BURDEN OF PROOF ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application (to exclude liability expert ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Order (re ex parte 6-14-13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Motion in Limine (#4 EXCLUDE INTRODUCTION OF DEF'S ATTORNEY BACKGROUND ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Motion in Limine (#3 EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL CONDUCT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Notice (OF RECUSAL AND OF CASE REASSIGNMNT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: DOUGLAS JAMES WESTHOFF BY SERVING: JESSENIA ROBELLO ON 6/21/12 AT 5:16 PM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: DOUGLAS JAMES WESTHOFF BY SERVING: JESSINIA ROBELLO ON 6/21/12 AT 5:16 PM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Declaration (OF DUE DILIGENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: WESTHOFF INVESTMENTS PERSON SERVED: JESSENIA ROBELLO ON 6/21/12 AT 5:16 PM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.