This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:27:44 (UTC).

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC ET AL VS PCS LINK INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2016 ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PCS LINK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0993

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROBERT HALF TECHNOLOGY

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC

Defendants and Respondents

GREENWOOD & HALL

GREENWOOD HALL INC

PCS LINK INC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HATKOFF & MINASSIAN ALC

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

3/8/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/15/2016: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

ORDER FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. SECTION 664.6)

11/15/2016: ORDER FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. SECTION 664.6)

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED ;ETC

11/16/2016: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED ;ETC

SUMMONS

11/16/2016: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

8/14/2017: ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Minute Order

8/14/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF NATALIA A. MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED AND FOR JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION PURSUANT TO WAIVER OF NOTICE UNDER STIPULATIO

8/14/2017: DECLARATION OF NATALIA A. MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED AND FOR JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION PURSUANT TO WAIVER OF NOTICE UNDER STIPULATIO

NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/14/17 AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

8/17/2017: NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/14/17 AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/14/17 AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 15; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NATALIA A. MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED AND FOR JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION PURSUANT TO WAIVER OF NOTICE UNDER STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Order; Filed by Robert Half International, Inc (Plaintiff); Robert Half Technology (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Stipulation; Filed by Robert Half International, Inc (Plaintiff); Robert Half Technology (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Robert Half International, Inc (Plaintiff); Robert Half Technology (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Robert Half International, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • ORDER FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. SECTION 664.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenwood Hall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERT HALF CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA ROBERT HALF FINANCE & ACCOUNTING is a litigant