This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2016 at 12:30:22 (UTC).

ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIF CORP VS CANON BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2014 ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIF CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CANON BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1132

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP

Defendants and Respondents

CANON BUILDERS INC A CALIFORNIA CORP

FOREMAN ALISA AN INDIVIDUAL

FOREMAN JON AN INDIVIDUAL

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KRAKOWSKY STEVEN P. ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZUBER LAWLER & DEL DUCA LLP

COLEMAN DERRICK F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO ROBERT C. WORTH, INC.?S AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/10/2014: CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO ROBERT C. WORTH, INC.?S AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/10/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

7/10/2014: SUMMONS

SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT; AND ENFORCEMENT OF MECHANIC?S LIEN RELEASE BOND.

7/10/2014: SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT; AND ENFORCEMENT OF MECHANIC?S LIEN RELEASE BOND.

SUMMONS ON SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT

7/10/2014: SUMMONS ON SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

7/10/2014: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT; AND FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC?S LIEN

7/10/2014: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT; AND FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC?S LIEN

CIVIL REGOSTER OF ACTIONS (SUMMARY)

7/10/2014: CIVIL REGOSTER OF ACTIONS (SUMMARY)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/22/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

7/25/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

8/6/2014: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.

Minute Order

2/11/2015: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST CANON BUILDERS, INC.

2/27/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST CANON BUILDERS, INC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $3,305 AGAINST DEFENDANT CANON BUILDERS

2/27/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $3,305 AGAINST DEFENDANT CANON BUILDERS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

4/1/2015: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

SUBSTI8TUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

4/7/2015: SUBSTI8TUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE COMPLIANCE DATE AND ORDER

4/28/2015: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE COMPLIANCE DATE AND ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/17/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE COMPLAINCE DATE ANS ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Order (ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MONETA RY SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents; to compel production of documents and for moneatry sanctions of $3,305 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Supporting Docs/ P's & A's (Separate Statement in support of Motion to compel further responses to request for production of docs. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Cross-complaint Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Notice of Incoming Case Transfer Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ACCOUNT STATED; QUANTUM MERUIT; AND ENFORCEMENT OF MECHANIC`S LIEN RELEASE BOND ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Request for Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where CANON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN DERRICK FIELDS