This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 01:09:54 (UTC).

ROBERT BRADY ET AL VS NAZ-DAR COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2010 ROBERT BRADY filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against NAZ-DAR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0151

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BRADY DAWN

BRADY ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

ASHLAND INC. (DOE 11)

B C STOCKING DISTRIBUTING

BRANDT FOX INCORPORATED (DOE 5)

BRANDT TECHNOLOGIES LLC (DOE 4)

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA (DOE 18)

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC. (DOE 19)

BRUMAH CASTROL HOLDINGS INC. (DOE 12)

BYK USA INC. (DOE 6)

CARAVAN INGREDIENTS INC. (DOE 3)

CARGILL INCORPORATED (DOE 8)

COLUMBIAN CHEMICALS COMPANY (DOE 9)

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY (DOE 15)

EVONIK DEGUSSA (DOE 10)

FUJIFILM NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

HYDRITE CHEMICAL CO. (DOE 14)

73 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

METZGER RAPHAEL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RIFF LAWRENCE P. ESQ.

HAWKINS HOWARD R. ATTORNEY AT LAW

COHEN-KATZ DEIDRE F. ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MURRAY JAMES G. ESQ.

KUM ROBERT ESQ.

LITTLETON JOYCE UGHETTA PARK & KELLY LLP

SHAFFERY JOHN ESQ.

SMITH STEPHEN H. ESQ.

QUINONES JOSHUA A. ESQ.

MUENCH RICHARD A. ESQ.

SWAN EDWARD PATRICK JR

FORGEY HEATHER J. ESQ.

SQUIRE SANDERS

NEWMAN NATHAN T. ESQ.

CORLESS THOMAS C. ESQ.

MEYER STEVEN E. ESQ.

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIGE LLP

31 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION AND ORDER RE ADVANCE JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 47, Debre K. Weintraub, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF CRT ORDER OF 12/16/13 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 47, Debre K. Weintraub, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketNotice (ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING, ETC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT, NAZDAR CO.,SUED AND SERVED AS "NAZ-DAR CO." ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET- TLEMENT, ETC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
458 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer ( BY DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT INC. TO P LAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM O F POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR T THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (Xenon Products, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Doe 1) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • DocketProof-Personal Service (Summons & Complaint, etc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (Union Rubber, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (Summons & Complaint, etc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DocketProof-Personal Service (Summons & Complaint, etc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (Summons & Complaint, etc. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BYK USA INC. (DOE 6) is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMBIAN CHEMICALS COMPANY (DOE 9) is a litigant

Latest cases where BRANDT TECHNOLOGIES LLC (DOE 4) is a litigant

Latest cases where CARAVAN INGREDIENTS INC. (DOE 3) is a litigant