This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 04:20:48 (UTC).

ROBERT A BAKER III ET AL VS FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATI

Case Summary

On 01/15/2014 ROBERT A BAKER III filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3217

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BAKER ROBERT A. III

SHULER RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

DRAGIVICH JEFF

FATTAL RON

FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATION

JONES RUGGE L.

MCCARTH RYAN

MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC

NIKRAVESH MICHAEL

DRAGICEVICH JEFF

PREWOZNIK MARILYN

PADICH YA-WEN HSU

KANATARYAN HASMIK

THOMPSON PHYLLIS COVINGTON

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

CANDELARIO FROY

RYAN MCCARTHY

BACA JOHN

Cross Defendants

VILLASENOR DILIA

HIGA JON

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HERRERA & ASSOCIATES P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DIJULIO R. DAVID ESQ.

STARK JOSEPH L. & ASSOCIATES

HERNANDEZ GEORGE J. JR. ESQ.

MCDANIEL JAMES EDWARD

GOOR RICHARD L. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

WINCHELL STERLING SCOTT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service -

5/21/2014: Proof of Service -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

5/21/2014: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/22/2014: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT RICHARD SHULER?S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

6/19/2014: PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT RICHARD SHULER?S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA ELDER ABUSE AND DEPENDENT ADULT ACT (CAL. WEIF. & INST. CODE ? 15600 ET SEQ.); ETC.

9/15/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA ELDER ABUSE AND DEPENDENT ADULT ACT (CAL. WEIF. & INST. CODE ? 15600 ET SEQ.); ETC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

10/10/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF FROYLAN CANDELARIO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND J. YAWEN HSU PADICH, AN INDIVIDUAL TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS ETC.

10/17/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF FROYLAN CANDELARIO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND J. YAWEN HSU PADICH, AN INDIVIDUAL TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS ETC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FROYLAN CANDELARIO AND J. YAWEN HSU PADICH AND FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATION, MICHAEL NIKRAVESH'S RESPECTIVE DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE [FILED VIA FACSIMILE TRANSMIS

12/30/2014: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FROYLAN CANDELARIO AND J. YAWEN HSU PADICH AND FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATION, MICHAEL NIKRAVESH'S RESPECTIVE DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE [FILED VIA FACSIMILE TRANSMIS

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA ELDER ABUSE AND DEPENDENT ADULT ACT (CAL. WELF. & INST. CODE 15600 ET SEQ.); ETC

3/3/2015: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA ELDER ABUSE AND DEPENDENT ADULT ACT (CAL. WELF. & INST. CODE 15600 ET SEQ.); ETC

DEFENDANTS MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, RYAN MCCARTHY AND JEFF DRAGICEVICH'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BASED ON PLAINTIFF ROBERT A. BAKER, III'S FAILURE TO TIMELY FI

3/5/2015: DEFENDANTS MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, RYAN MCCARTHY AND JEFF DRAGICEVICH'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BASED ON PLAINTIFF ROBERT A. BAKER, III'S FAILURE TO TIMELY FI

ORDER OF JUDGMENT DISMISSING FROYLAN CANDELARIO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND J. YA-WEN HSU PADICH, AN INDIVIDUAL BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THE TIME ORDERED BY THE CO

3/24/2015: ORDER OF JUDGMENT DISMISSING FROYLAN CANDELARIO, AN INDIVIDUAL AND J. YA-WEN HSU PADICH, AN INDIVIDUAL BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THE TIME ORDERED BY THE CO

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

4/15/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING

4/30/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

DECLARATION OF TIFFANY KROG RE NON-RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFFS ROBERT A. BAKER III AND RICHARD SHULER'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, RYAN MCCARTHY AND JEFF DRAGICEVICH'S NOTICE OF MOTI

6/2/2015: DECLARATION OF TIFFANY KROG RE NON-RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFFS ROBERT A. BAKER III AND RICHARD SHULER'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, RYAN MCCARTHY AND JEFF DRAGICEVICH'S NOTICE OF MOTI

Minute Order -

7/13/2015: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER AND JUDGMENT BASED UPON MISTAICE, SURPRISE, INADVERTENCE OR EXCUSABLE NEGLECT; DECLARATION OF ALEX HERRERA; PROPOSED ORDER

7/31/2015: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER AND JUDGMENT BASED UPON MISTAICE, SURPRISE, INADVERTENCE OR EXCUSABLE NEGLECT; DECLARATION OF ALEX HERRERA; PROPOSED ORDER

DEFENDANTS FROY CANDELARIO AND J. YA-WEN HSU PADICH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF BASED UPON MISTAKE, ETC.

8/14/2015: DEFENDANTS FROY CANDELARIO AND J. YA-WEN HSU PADICH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF BASED UPON MISTAKE, ETC.

CROSS-COMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF E?IFFANY KROG DECLARATION OF JEFF DRAGICEVICH

8/27/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF E?IFFANY KROG DECLARATION OF JEFF DRAGICEVICH

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 14, Terry A. Green, Presiding; Motion for Arrearages (*ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE CROSS-COMPLAINT; *READY FOR REVIEW 6/29) - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: 8-26-15 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CROSS-COMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 14, Terry A. Green, Presiding; Motion (FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER ANDJUDGMENT;) - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketOrder (ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketOpposition Document (opp to mtn for relief ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 14, Terry A. Green, Presiding; Motion to Quash - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketOpposition Document (OPP TO MTN TO QUASH; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ALEX H. HERRERA ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketJoinder (ex parte application to dismiss ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLANT; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. Ay v vy i

DIJULIO LAW GROUP

A Law Corporation

330 N. Brand Blvd.

Suite 702

Glendale Cahforma

gls) 502-1700 ' FAX (818) 500-8799 David DlJllllO SBN 110478]

Tiffany A. Krog, [ BN 212915]

tak@dijuliolaw.com

INVESTMENTS, LLC

O 0 ~J O th » W N —

— O

ROBERT A. BAKER III, a California individual: ROBERT A. BAKER III TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT A. BAKER III LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 27, 2010; RICHARD SHULER, a California individual

— peed

SN WD

FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING

CORPORATION, a California co oratlon MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, Callfomla lumted llablllg' cor}lganPy RYAN MCC an individual

DRAGIC EVICH an individual; MICHAEL NIKRAVESH, an individual; RON FATTAL, an 1nd1v1du11 RUGGEL. JONES anmd1V1dual P LIS COVINGTON THOMPSON, an individual; MARILYN PREWOZNIK, an individual; FROY CANDELARIO, an mdmdual JOHN BACA, an md1v1dual J. YA-WEN HSU PADICH, an 1nd1v1dual HASMIK KANATARYAN DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive

D DN NN NN = e e

N W N = O O 00

{7 Defendants.

MC DRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC, a

;:‘T'js California limited liability company,

i &N oo

Attorney for Cross-Complainant MCDRAGS

FILED

Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles

® AUG 27 2015

Shernt R Carter, Execytive Officer/Clerk By . Deputy Mansa Vdniura ‘

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CENTRAL DISTRICT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CASE NUMBER: BC533217 Unlimited Jurisdiction

e Assigned to the Honorable ™ % Terry Green [Department 14]3 oo

Complaint Filed: January 15, &9 14': v

CROSS-COMPLAINANT * & MCDRAGS

INVESTMENTS, LLC’S CASE

SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT ON FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF TIFFANY

KROG: DECLARATION OF JEFF

DRAGICEVICH

- . 1 . CROSS-COMPLAINANT MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS, LLC’S CASE SUMMARY IN

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST NATIONAL FUNDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINCHELL STERLING SCOTT ESQ.