This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:28:36 (UTC).

RITA CUCCI ET AL VS MARLON MCKNIGHT ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 RITA CUCCI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARLON MCKNIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8639

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

DOES JANE

DOES JOHN

MARK HAROLD

MARK JANE DOE

MCKNIGHT JANE DOE

MCKNIGHT MARLON

XYZ CORPORATIONS

ABC PARTNERSHIP

DEF TRUSTS

Minor

CUCCI MYA Y

Guardian Ad Litem

CUCCI RITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SPRIGGS SCOTT B. ESQ.

Minor Attorney

BIDWELL JAY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/13/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/28/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/5/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/5/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/5/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

8/17/2015: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/23/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/20/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARD1AN AD LITEM?CIVIL /EX PARTE

7/20/2015: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARD1AN AD LITEM?CIVIL /EX PARTE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARD1AN AD LITEMCIVIL /EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC PARTNERSHIPS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRIGGS SCOTT B.