This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:06:03 (UTC).

RICK BARRETT VS. GMA MORTGAGE, LLC., ET. AL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2013 RICK BARRETT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GMA MORTGAGE, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7373

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRETT RICK

Defendants

EXECUTIVE TRUSTREE SERVICES LLC

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

GMAC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

DOES 1-100

ETS SERVICES LLC

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

GMAC MORTGAGE CORPORATION - Defendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SEVERSON & WERSON LAW OFFICES OF

NATALIE R. TERAMOTO

RYU LAW FIRM APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2013
  • Notice (of entry of judgment ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& NOTICE OF RELATED CASES ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Disclaimer (OF ITNEREST & DECLARATION OF NON MONETARY STATUS OF COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.