Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:21:30 (UTC).

RICHTON LTD ET AL VS TENG HUANG ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2015 RICHTON LTD filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TENG HUANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5477

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RICHTON LTD.

WANG GARY F.

STAUNTON GROUP LLC THE

STAUTON GROUP THE

WANG EVA Y.

HUANG NELSON L.

THE STAUNTON GROUP LLC DBA THE STAUNTON GROUP

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

YU HUA LONG INVESTMENTS LLC

HUANG TENG

SINGPOLI GROUP LLC

CHIANG DAVE

WONG ANTHONY WAI-KONG

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

MAGNUS SUNHILL GROUP LLC

SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION INVEST L.A.

INVEST L.A. REGIONAL CENTER LLC

SINGPOLI (HOP KIN) CONSTRUCTION &

SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION

SINGPOLI GROUP LLC DBA SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION

HUI KIN [DOE 1]

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

HUI KIN [DOE 1]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEE ANAV CHUNG WHITE & KIM LLP

LEE BUB-JOO SALVADOR

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CURD JOSEPH D. ESQ.

HARRIGAN PAUL

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

TRESTER FREDRIC WARD

LEVENE NEALE BENDER YOO & BRILL LLP

ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CURD JOSEPH D.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF RICHTON LTD.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TENG HUANG TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

3/29/2018: PLAINTIFF RICHTON LTD.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TENG HUANG TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

6/12/2018: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/3/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion re:

12/14/2018: Motion re:

Notice

1/8/2019: Notice

Notice of Ruling

1/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition

1/14/2019: Opposition

Notice of Joinder

6/4/2019: Notice of Joinder

Minute Order

6/26/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION ("LIS PENDENS")

12/30/2015: NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION ("LIS PENDENS")

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/29/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANTS' YU HUA LONG INVESTMENTS, LLC'S AND ANTHONY WAI KONG WONG'S, AND PARTY- AFFILIATED WITNESS NANCY CHANG'S, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NANCY CH

5/23/2016: DEFENDANTS' YU HUA LONG INVESTMENTS, LLC'S AND ANTHONY WAI KONG WONG'S, AND PARTY- AFFILIATED WITNESS NANCY CHANG'S, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NANCY CH

CROSS-DEFENDANT PHOEBE HUANG'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF KIN HUI, TENG HUANG, AND ANNIE CACCIOTTI IN OPPOSITION TO PHOEBE HUANG?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

10/27/2016: CROSS-DEFENDANT PHOEBE HUANG'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF KIN HUI, TENG HUANG, AND ANNIE CACCIOTTI IN OPPOSITION TO PHOEBE HUANG?S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PHILIP KIM DECLARATION FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PHILIP KIM DECLARATION FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS SINGPOLI GROUP, LLC; SINGPOLI (HOP KIN) CONSTRUCTION & DECORATION (NEVADA), INC.; AND, INVEST L.A. REGIONAL CENTER, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNAT

12/8/2017: DEFENDANTS SINGPOLI GROUP, LLC; SINGPOLI (HOP KIN) CONSTRUCTION & DECORATION (NEVADA), INC.; AND, INVEST L.A. REGIONAL CENTER, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNAT

SINGPOLI DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/8/2017: SINGPOLI DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service

12/8/2017: Proof of Service

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Reply (Brief in Support of Motion to Sever/Bifurcate Trial); Filed by Singpoli Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SINOPOLI DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF SAAM TAKALOO); Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Declaration (OF NELSON HUANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO SINGPOLI DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE TRIAL); Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) ( AND JOINDER IN MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE TRIAL); Filed by Anthony Wai-Kong Wong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by Singpoli Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
418 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION ("LIS PENDENS")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Plaintiff's First Amended [Verified] Complaint for: (1) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (2) Rescission; (3) Quiet Title; (4) Slander of Title; (5) Declaratory Relief; (6) Abuse of Control; (7) Corporate Waste; (8) Conversion; (9) Trespass to Chattel; (10) etc.; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED (VERIFIED) COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION ("LIS PENDENS")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Nelson L. Huang (Plaintiff); Richton Ltd. (Plaintiff); The Staunton Group LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • PLAINTIFFS [VERIFIED] COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC605477    Hearing Date: March 8, 2021    Dept: 55

RICHTON LTD. v. TENG HUANG BC605477

Hearing Date: 3/8/21, Dept. 55

#1: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT.

Notice: Okay

No Opposition

MP: Defendant, ANTHONY WONG.

RP:

Summary

On 12/28/15, plaintiffs RICHTON LTD., EVA Y. WANG, GARY F. WANG, NELSON L. HUANG and THE STAUNTON GROUP LLC, filed a Complaint.

On 1/8/16, plaintiffs filed a First Amended Complaint, alleging acts of corporate looting and disloyalty, done by TENG HUANG, against MAGNUS SUNHILLGROUP, LLC, and its minority members. The causes of action are:

(1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY;

(2) RESCISSION;

(3) QUIET TITLE;

(4) SLANDER OF TITLE;

(5) DECLARATORY RELIEF;

(6) ABUSE OF CONTROL;

(7) CORPORATE WASTE;

(8) CONVERSION;

(9) TRESPASS TO CHATTEL;

(10) FRAUD / INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION;

(11) NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION;

(12) INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS / INDUCING BREACH OF CONTRACT;

(13) NEGLIGENCE;

(14) ACCOUNTING;

(15) UNJUST ENRICHMENT / CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST;

(16) UNFAIR COMPETITION [Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code § 17200 et seq.]; AND

(17) INJUNCTION.

On 3/4/16, Cross-Complainants KIN HUI, SINGPOLI GROUP, LLC DBA SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION, SINGPOLI (HOP KIN) CONSTRUCTION & DECORATION (NEVADA), INC. DBA SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION, and INVEST L.A. REGIONAL CENTER, LLC, filed a Cross-Complaint, against Cross-Defendant PHOEBE HUANG, alleging that Cross-defendant has been defaming cross-defendants, in making specified and unspecified statements that impugn cross-complainants in their trade or business as successful real estate developers.

On 5/4/16, Cross-Defendant PHOEBE HUANG filed a Cross-Complaint, against Cross-Complainant SINGPOLI GROUP, LLC, and others, for equitable and partial indemnity.

On 12/7/16 and 12/8/16, notices of appeal were filed, as to the SLAPP motion denial, filed 11/3/16, after PHOEBE HUANG had moved to strike Cross-Defendants' Cross-Complaint for defamation.

On 12/15/16, Defendant YU HUA LONG INVESTMENTS LLC filed a notice of bankruptcy stay.

MP Positions

Moving party requests an order enforcing a settlement agreement, on bases including the following:

· The settlement agreement was signed by moving Defendant and the plaintiffs, at the December 5, 2019 mediation.

· It was approved by order, as a good faith settlement, on June 22, 2020.

· Despite signing a valid and enforceable settlement agreement, Plaintiffs reneged on their obligations, and refuse to accept the settlement funds, and to dismiss Anthony Wong. Tentative Ruling

The unopposed motion is granted, as prayed. CCP § 664.6.

Courts are empowered to enter judgments pursuant to written settlements signed by the parties. Elyaoudayan v. Hoffman (2003) 104 Cal.App.4th 1421, 1428; CCP §664.6.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SINGOLI GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SINGPOLI CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where MAGNUS SUNHILL GROUP LLC is a litigant