This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 07:22:13 (UTC).

RICHARD WOLFENSTEIN VS THE QUEEN MARY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 RICHARD WOLFENSTEIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE QUEEN MARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8103

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WOLFENSTEIN RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

QUEEN MARY THE

BLACKHAWK PROTECTION (DOE 1)

QUEEN MARY THE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS)

SAVE THE QUEEN LLC

BLACKHAWK PROTECTION DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC C. ALBERTS

Defendant Attorneys

REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

OFFENHAUSER TYLER D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENT SECURITY; ASSAULT AND BATTERY; FALSE IMPRISONMENT

10/20/2015: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENT SECURITY; ASSAULT AND BATTERY; FALSE IMPRISONMENT

SUMMONS

10/20/2015: SUMMONS

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/11/2015: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/11/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/11/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

1/15/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

2/3/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

JOSEPH GANINO, JR. DBA BLACKHAWK PROTECTION'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SAVE THE QUEEN, LLC

3/2/2016: JOSEPH GANINO, JR. DBA BLACKHAWK PROTECTION'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SAVE THE QUEEN, LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/22/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/13/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/25/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/4/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Save the Queen, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Richard Wolfenstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • JOSEPH GANINO, JR. DBA BLACKHAWK PROTECTION'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SAVE THE QUEEN, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Richard Wolfenstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Save the Queen, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Save the Queen, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by (Defendant); Save the Queen, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Richard Wolfenstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENT SECURITY; ASSAULT AND BATTERY; FALSE IMPRISONMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant

Latest cases where SAVE THE QUEEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OFFENHAUSER TYLER D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.