Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:56:17 (UTC).

RICHARD ROGACHEFSKY ET AL VS RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT LLC

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 RICHARD ROGACHEFSKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7017

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

ROGACHEFSKY RICHARD M.D.

ROGACHEFSKY TARA

TARA ROGACHEFSKY

RICHARD ROGACHEFSKY M.D.

ROGACHEFSKY M.D. RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

DOE DEFENDANTS 1 THROUGH 100

RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT LLC

DOE DEFENDANTS 1-100

SUNSTONE HOTEL PROPERTIES INC. DOE 3

EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY LLC DOE 1

RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT LLC.

INTERSTATE HOTELS AND RESORTS INC. DOE2

RIMB TT LLC DOE 3

Minors

ROGACHEFSKY BENJAMIN

ROGACHEFSKY MICHAEL

MICHAEL ROGACHEFSKY

BENJAMIN ROGACHEFSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT K. KENT

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN WOLFSON A.P.L.C.

ROBERT K. KENT LAW OFFICE OF

WOLFSON STEVE

KENT ROBERT KALLMAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COLLINSON LAW

COLLINSON LISA D. ESQ.

SHOCH LOUIS

AUSTIN TODD MICHAEL

FOGELMAN JAMES PRESCOTT

SHOCH LOUIS ELWOOD III

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

7/9/2019: Stipulation and Order

Legacy Document

1/19/2016: Legacy Document

Summons

3/24/2016: Summons

Case Management Statement

4/5/2016: Case Management Statement

Declaration

4/14/2016: Declaration

Other -

2/8/2017: Other -

Legacy Document

2/8/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/26/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/25/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

1/25/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

7/3/2018: Legacy Document

Order

3/19/2019: Order

Reply

6/6/2019: Reply

Declaration

7/1/2019: Declaration

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/21/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

DEFENDANT RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOT, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/14/2015: DEFENDANT RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOT, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING

9/29/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

152 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 2:38 PM in Department M; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Richard Rogachefsky, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Request for Admission and Relating form Interrogatories to Defendant Residence Inn By Marriot, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR BENJAMIN ROGACHEFSKY GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR MICHAEL ROGACHEFSKY GUARDIAN ADLITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT CF GUARDIAN AD LITEMC1VIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF C3LJARDIAN AD LITEMGIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Residence Inn By Marriott, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Richard Rogachefsky, M.D. (Plaintiff); Michael Rogachefsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Rogachefsky, M.D. (Plaintiff); Richard Rogachefsky, M.D. (Plaintiff); Tara Rogachefsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC577017    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka

Department B

Monday, August 3, 2020

Calendar No. 7

PROCEEDINGS

Richard Rogachefsky, M.D., et al. v. Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC

BC577017

  1. Louis E. Shoch’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant RIMB TT, LLC

    TENTATIVE RULING

    Louis E. Shoch’s, of Law Office of Louis Shoch, Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant RIMB TT, LLC is granted.

    Louis E. Shoch of Law Offices of Louis Shoch, Counsel for Defendant RIMB TT, LLC moves to be relieved as counsel. Counsel states, in his declaration, valid reasons for withdrawal.

    The court finds that the attorney has served the client and filed a declaration establishing that the service requirements of California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362, have been satisfied. The court also finds that the attorney has shown sufficient reasons why the motion to be relieved as counsel should be granted and why the attorney has brought a motion under Code of Civil Procedure § 284(2) instead of filing a consent under section 284(1). While the client has consented to the withdrawal, a substitution of counsel could not be filed because the client is a corporation which has yet to retain new counsel.

    The motion is therefore granted.

    The court orders that the attorney is relieved as counsel of record for defendant RIMB TT, LLC effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed “Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel – Civil” (Judicial Council form MC-053) upon the client. Defendant’s counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling and the “Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel – Civil” (Judicial Council form MC-053).

Case Number: BC577017    Hearing Date: July 15, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka

Department B

Wednesday, July 15, 2020

Calendar No. 7

PROCEEDINGS

Richard Rogachefsky, M.D., et al. v. Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC

BC577017

  1. Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC’s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Service of Plaintiffs’ Second Amended Complaint

    TENTATIVE RULING

    Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC’s Motion to Dismiss or Quash Service of Plaintiffs’ Second Amended Complaint is moot.

    Moving party, non-party Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC, is not a party to this action. Moving party was dismissed in this action on April 1, 2016. Thus, it has no obligation to respond to service of a summons and complaint to which it was not a party. The fact that moving party is not a party was reiterated twice, first in the Court’s ruling denying Plaintiff’s motion to compel discovery responses against moving party and, second, in denying Plaintiff’s motion for reconsideration of this order.

    As indicated, Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC was dismissed from this action on April 1, 2016. In the prior discovery motion and reconsideration motion, Plaintiffs argued extensively that they did not intend to dismiss this entity but instead to dismiss solely the specific Torrance hotel. Simply because the dismissal included the address of the specific hotel location owned by this Defendant does not mean that the dismissal was not effective to dismiss this entity.

    Therefore, because moving party is not a party to this action, any motion to dismiss this entity is moot. In addition, any motion to quash service to this entity is moot because it has no obligation to respond to a summons in an action to which it is not a party.

    The moving party, non-party Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC, is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERSTATE HOTELS & RESORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Residence Inn by Marriott LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINSON LISA D. ESQ.