This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 21:07:17 (UTC).

RICHARD KORNGUTE ETAL VS. JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2014 RICHARD KORNGUTE ETAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JMS AIR CONDITIONING APPLIANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA HART COLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4535

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA HART COLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KORNGUTE ANITA F.

KORNGUTE RICHARD

Defendants

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVIC

JMS A/C & HEATING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBAUM LAWRENCE S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY FROM MECHANICS LIEN, WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (RE PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 8480, ET SEQ. ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice of Hearing (ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 8480, ET SEQ. ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMS A/C & HEATING is a litigant

Latest cases where JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBAUM LAWRENCE S