This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 01:46:42 (UTC).

RICHARD ELLIS VS BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2011 RICHARD ELLIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7851

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ELLIS RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHOR-

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

GOMEZ HENRY (SERGANT)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOEGH THOMAS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

NOVICK MINDY S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. 1NSCR1MLN,V NON IN VIOLATION OF FEHA (CAL. GO. CODE 12940, ET SEQ.; ETC.

3/22/2011: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. 1NSCR1MLN,V NON IN VIOLATION OF FEHA (CAL. GO. CODE 12940, ET SEQ.; ETC.

SUMMONS -

3/22/2011: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/20/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY AND HENRY GOMEZS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/29/2011: DEFENDANTS BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY AND HENRY GOMEZS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/11/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/27/2011: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND IPIIJ1FFLF1ID1 PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

10/20/2011: STIPULATION AND IPIIJ1FFLF1ID1 PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

ORDER

10/21/2011: ORDER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/26/2011: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

PROOF OF SERVICE RE STIPULATED EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES

12/2/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE RE STIPULATED EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES

STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES; ETC

12/2/2011: STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES; ETC

Minute Order -

12/2/2011: Minute Order -

ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULATED EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES

12/2/2011: ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULATED EX PARTE TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL STATUTORY CUT-OFF DATES

STATUTORY OFFER TO COMPROMISE (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 998)

1/20/2012: STATUTORY OFFER TO COMPROMISE (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 998)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/17/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

2/21/2012: Minute Order -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (entire action with prejudice ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (STATUTORY OFFER TO COMPROMISE ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Trial continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVICK MINDY S. ESQ.