Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:18:25 (UTC).

RICBERAY INC., VS JOSE LUIS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 RICBERAY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE LUIS MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8473

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICBERAY INC.

SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK

Defendants

MARTINEZ JUANA

MARTINEZ JOSE LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAM GREGORY B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by RICBERAY INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Stipulated Judgment; Filed by RICBERAY INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Answer; Filed by JOSE LUIS MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Answer; Filed by JUANA MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department O; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Challenge; Filed by RICBERAY INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by RICBERAY INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICBERAY INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAM GREGORY BRUCE