This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:25:25 (UTC).

RICARDO DE LA ROSA VS BEL AIR INTERNET LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 RICARDO DE LA ROSA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEL AIR INTERNET LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1970

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DE LA ROSA RICARDO

Defendants and Respondents

BEL AIR INTERNET LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HERNANDEZ & SCHAPIRO INC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DERBY PAUL B.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/15/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO COMPENSATE FOR ALL HOURS WORKED; ETC

5/15/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO COMPENSATE FOR ALL HOURS WORKED; ETC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/24/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/27/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/28/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CIC.P. ?998

8/4/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CIC.P. ?998

Minute Order

8/5/2015: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/2/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/6/2015: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ricardo De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CIC.P. 998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Ricardo De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Ricardo De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Bel Air Internet, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Ricardo De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO COMPENSATE FOR ALL HOURS WORKED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEL AIR INTERNET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DERBY PAUL B.