This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:48:37 (UTC).

REZAIE CORPORATION VS FERESHTEH REZAI

Case Summary

On 03/18/2016 REZAIE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FERESHTEH REZAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4289

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

REZAIE CORPORATION

COURTYARD SALON THE

Defendants and Respondents

REZAI FERESHTEH

DOE DEFENDANTS 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KENT ROBERT K. ESQ.

WOLFSON STEVEN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KAMRAN M.H. TONY ESQ.

RAMENIAN DONALD R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC

3/18/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC

SUMMONS

3/18/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THERETO

5/9/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THERETO

Unknown

5/10/2016: Unknown

Unknown

5/10/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/27/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/29/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/29/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

8/4/2016: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

8/8/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ROBERT K. KENT

8/8/2016: NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ROBERT K. KENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

8/8/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order

8/17/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

9/12/2016: NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC

9/16/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL

10/19/2016: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 46; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 46; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Rezaie Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DEFENDANT FERESHTEH REZAI'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Fereshteh Rezai (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Fereshteh Rezai (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S DEFECTIVE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Fereshteh Rezai (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Rezaie Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENT ROBERT K.