This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 08:29:44 (UTC).

REZA SAFAIE, ET AL VS. HOMEYRA MYRA ARBABI AND DOES 1-50

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 REZA SAFAIE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOMEYRA MYRA ARBABI AND DOES 1-50. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4670

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S.B.R.S. INC.

SAFAIE REZA

Defendants

DOES 1-50

ARBABI HOMEYRA MYRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEUMANN THOMAS R.

SEMNAR BABAK

Defendant Attorney

REISS SAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Stipulation & Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Miscellaneous; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Homeyra Myra Arbabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (Motion-Leave; Granted) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • Objection; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (Application-Ex Parte; Denied-Without prejudice) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Opposition; Filed by Homeyra Myra Arbabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Homeyra Myra Arbabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Reza Safaie (Plaintiff); S.B.R.S., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less