Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 01:09:15 (UTC).

REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ VS ALASKA AIRLINES INC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALASKA AIRLINES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2077

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DE ORTIZ REYNALDA CRUZ

Defendants and Respondents

ALASKA AIRLINES INC

DOES 1-50

ALASKA AIRLINES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RANDOLPH & ASSOCIATES APC

RANDOLPH & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILLNER ARTHUR I. ESQ.

ARTHUR I. WILLNER ESQ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/14/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/14/2018: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

3/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/3/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/24/2018: Unknown

Other -

6/25/2018: Other -

Minute Order

6/25/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

1/11/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

1/14/2019: Minute Order

Order

1/14/2019: Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/31/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

5/31/2016: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT ALASKA AIRLINES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

4/12/2017: DEFENDANT ALASKA AIRLINES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

9/18/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:34 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Order (Granting ex parte); Filed by REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Dates); Filed by REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [ AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DEFENDANT ALASKA AIRLINES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by REYNALDA CRUZ DE ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC622077    Hearing Date: April 13, 2021    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka Tuesday, April 13, 2021

Department B Calendar No. 7

PROCEEDINGS

Reynalda Cruz De Ortiz v. Alaska Airlines, Inc., et al.

BC622077

  1. Alaska Airlines, Inc.’s Motion to Enforce Settlement

TENTATIVE RULING

Alaska Airlines, Inc.’s Motion to Enforce Settlement is granted.

Background

Plaintiff filed her Complaint on May 31, 2016. Plaintiff alleges the following facts: On May 29, 2014, Plaintiff was a paying passenger on Defendant Alaska Airlines. While the aircraft was at the gate prior to departure, luggage fell from the overhead storage compartment onto Plaintiff’s head and neck while she was seated onboard Defendant's aircraft. Plaintiff suffered serious physical injuries to her head and neck.

Motion to Enforce Settlement

CCP § 664.6 states: “If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.”

On August 12, 2020, the parties entered into a “Stipulation for Settlement.” (Defendant’s Ex. A.) The stipulation states that the court shall retain jurisdiction and that the settlement may be enforced pursuant to CCP § 664.6. The stipulation states that in exchange for payment by Defendant to Plaintiff in the sum of $82,500, Plaintiff will execute a mutual release. (Id.) However, Defendant submitted evidence that Plaintiff is refusing to execute the mutual release. (Decl., Arthur Willner, ¶¶ 5-6.)

Therefore, Defendant’s Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to execute the mutual release.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALASKA AIRLINES C/O STEPHANIE CARDENEZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLNER ARTHUR IRWIN