Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 08:33:31 (UTC).

RETAIL PACK VS J B BLOOMERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2015 RETAIL PACK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J B BLOOMERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7927

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RETAIL PACK

PACK RETAIL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

J.B. BLOOMERS

LIPSKY BARRY

LIPSKY RALEIGH

RA BLOOMERS INC.

J.B. BLOOMERS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

SUED J.B. BLOOMERS ERRONEOUSLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JONES DAVIS & JACKSON P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BIALACK EDWARD M.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/7/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/30/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/1/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/18/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/18/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/4/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/18/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/1/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

3/7/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/13/2016: Minute Order

PROCEEDINGS

10/4/2016: PROCEEDINGS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/27/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

1/27/2017: Minute Order

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Barry Lipsky (Defendant); Raleigh Lipsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by RA Bloomers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Retail Pack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Retail Pack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Retail Pack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNT STATED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Retail Pack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2015
  • Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com; Filed by Retail Pack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIALACK EDWARD M. ESQ.