Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:21:41 (UTC).

RESHONA PITTS VS SETERUS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/06/2015 RESHONA PITTS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SETERUS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1119

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PITTS RESHONA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

RNA LLC

SETERUS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BOYKO JOHN M. ESQ.

POTEAT TRAVIS

BOYKO JOHN MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RYAN TIMOTHY M. ESQ.

YUN LISA J.

RYAN TIMOTHY MATTHEW ESQ.

YUN LISA J

 

Court Documents

Declaration

1/28/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

3/19/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULINC RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE

3/8/2018: NOTICE OF RULINC RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/17/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO BIFURCATE AND FOR A SEPARATE TRIAL OF ISSUES OF FORMATION OF CONTRACT AND EXISTENCE OF DUTY OF CARE

12/29/2017: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO BIFURCATE AND FOR A SEPARATE TRIAL OF ISSUES OF FORMATION OF CONTRACT AND EXISTENCE OF DUTY OF CARE

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS INC. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/29/2017: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SETERUS INC. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OUTSTANDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL

1/5/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE OUTSTANDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF HOME OWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS; ETC

5/6/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF HOME OWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS; ETC

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC.'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

8/10/2015: NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC.'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/14/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/29/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT RNA, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/4/2015: DEFENDANT RNA, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order

7/14/2017: Minute Order

(REVISED) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

8/3/2017: (REVISED) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

NOTICE OF CONTINUED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

9/22/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

12/8/2017: Minute Order

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 BY DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC. TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE VALUE OF THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY EXCEPT FOR THE SALES PRICE OBTAINED AT THE TIME OF THE TRUSTEE'S SALE; DECLARATI

12/19/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 BY DEFENDANT SETERUS, INC. TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO THE VALUE OF THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTY EXCEPT FOR THE SALES PRICE OBTAINED AT THE TIME OF THE TRUSTEE'S SALE; DECLARATI

194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplemental Declaration of John M Boyko in Support of Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 1); Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 6 to Exclude Any Documents Not Produced in Discovery); Filed by Seterus, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine No. 3); Filed by Seterus, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
427 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Reshona Pitts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF HOME OWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC581119    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: 73

Partial tentative only due to technical difficulties.  The clerk will email the full tentative. 

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RNA Corporation, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Seterus Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF LISA J. YUN - LISA J. YUN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN TIMOTHY M