Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 22:45:21 (UTC).

REGINALD SPARKS VS BERTHA VILLARREAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/29/2012 REGINALD SPARKS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BERTHA VILLARREAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6468

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPARKS REGINALD

Defendants and Respondents

CAMACHO NATALIE

MOHAMMAD HALIMA

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

VILLARREAL BERTHA

AT&T CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIKINS LAW FIRM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PACIFIC TELESIS GROUP LEGAL DEPARTMENT

HAMASAKI LISA C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

1/28/2013: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/22/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATION OF LENTON AIKJNS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 2.5 AND 4.1

7/1/2013: DECLARATION OF LENTON AIKJNS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 2.5 AND 4.1

PLAINTIFF REGINALD SPARKS?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE OF VIOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION; FOR AND ORDER ESTABLISH DEPOSIT

8/6/2013: PLAINTIFF REGINALD SPARKS?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE OF VIOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION; FOR AND ORDER ESTABLISH DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT HALIMA MUHAMMAD?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/9/2013: DEFENDANT HALIMA MUHAMMAD?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT BERTHA VILLARREAL?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/9/2013: DEFENDANT BERTHA VILLARREAL?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF HOLLY R. LAKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S AUGUST 23, 2013, EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/23/2013: DECLARATION OF HOLLY R. LAKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S AUGUST 23, 2013, EX PARTE APPLICATION

DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S AUGUST 23, 2013, EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/23/2013: DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S AUGUST 23, 2013, EX PARTE APPLICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEPOSITON DISPUTED FACT-TESTIMONY CRC 3-1345

8/27/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEPOSITON DISPUTED FACT-TESTIMONY CRC 3-1345

Minute Order -

9/17/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/20/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO MOVE FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; ESTABLISH DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR SANCTIONS.

10/1/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO MOVE FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; ESTABLISH DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR SANCTIONS.

NOTICE OF LODGING OF VIDEO TAPE OF THE DEPOSITION OF HALIMA MOHAMMAD RE: MOTION TO COMPEL

10/15/2013: NOTICE OF LODGING OF VIDEO TAPE OF THE DEPOSITION OF HALIMA MOHAMMAD RE: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF ISSUES RESOLVED AND ISSUES REMAINING RE: MOTION TO ESTABLISH DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST HOLY R. LAKE, AT[ORNEY AT LAW

10/15/2013: NOTICE OF ISSUES RESOLVED AND ISSUES REMAINING RE: MOTION TO ESTABLISH DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST HOLY R. LAKE, AT[ORNEY AT LAW

DECLARATION OF JANINE S. SIMERLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HALIMA MUHAMMAD AND HER COUNSEL OF RECORD HOLLY R. LAKES OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

10/18/2013: DECLARATION OF JANINE S. SIMERLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HALIMA MUHAMMAD AND HER COUNSEL OF RECORD HOLLY R. LAKES OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

REPLY TO HALIMA MUHAMMAD AND HER COUNSEL, HOLLY R. LAKE?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AND DECLARATION OF LENTON AIKINS

10/24/2013: REPLY TO HALIMA MUHAMMAD AND HER COUNSEL, HOLLY R. LAKE?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AND DECLARATION OF LENTON AIKINS

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS

10/31/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS

Minute Order -

2/5/2014: Minute Order -

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketNotice (OSC ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketNotice ( OSC ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on plaintiff's motion for protective order and sanctions ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (ALL DEFENDANTS) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hamasaki, Lisa C.